+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3003) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, WAM.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 254).
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 925-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Todd, Tupola.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 480-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor