+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 562-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading