+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 204-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-23-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-23-14 at 2:00pm.
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-17-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 82), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor