+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-16 11:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16 11:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/JUD on Friday, 02-12-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading