+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-19-13 at 3:15 PM in Conference Room 325.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-19-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Yamashita Co-Chairs; C. Lee, Thielen.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 3).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 598) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, Ige, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Espero, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-13.
- Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2).
- Floor Amendment No. 11 offered.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1299) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-21-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 10:05AM in conference room 16.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 82).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Ing, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Evans, Fale, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ito, Kawakami, Onishi, Oshiro, Takayama, Takumi, Tokioka, Yamashita voting no (12) and Representative(s) Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Cabanilla, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Ito, C. Lee, Wooley.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor