+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 687).
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:30PM in conference room 429.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 429.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 429.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Tokuda, Riviere Co-Chairs.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Evans, Holt Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 761) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-10-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3649) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3098) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
- The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 3:30PM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/LBR, WAM.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 247).
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Kobayashi.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 641-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-14-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 124-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
- Referred to LAB, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor