+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-02-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-17.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-22-17.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-17 2:05PM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-17 at 2:05PM.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor