+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 10:00AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14 at 10:00AM.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-07-14 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading