+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-11-16 5:01PM in conference room 325.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16 at 2:00PM.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-10-16 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 02-08-16 2:05PM in conference room 325.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-08-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor