+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/TRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 347).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, DeCoite, Har, Keohokalole, Kong, McKelvey, Ohno, San Buenaventura, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 879-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 549-16), recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro, Yamane, McDermott.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16 2:00PM.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-16 5:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading