+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Luke, Cachola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-28-14 4:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 3:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 3:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 2:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 2:30PM in conference room 423.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Kidani, Wakai, Slom Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Luke Co-Chairs; Cachola, Ward Members.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 666) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3280) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-28-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2846) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-14 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 380).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Choy, Hanohano, Ing, Jordan, McKelvey, Oshiro, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ito voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 875-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Choy, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 421-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-11-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor