+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Har, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 467-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Fale; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-14 11:35AM in conference room 325.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-14 at 11:15AM.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-04-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor