+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/HRE/CPH, WAM.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 243).
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 649-18), recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHS with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 160-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHS.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor