+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 712) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:30AM in conference room 312.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19 10:30AM in House conference room 312.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-08-19 11:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor