+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan, Say voting no (2) and none excused (0).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 64-16).
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05/03/16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 64-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Rhoads, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 1:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 1:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 1:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Nishimoto, Pouha.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Galuteria, Slom.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 626) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-12-16.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3467) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, L. Thielen.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-31-16 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3000) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-16 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA, JDL.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 157).
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-16 2:05PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-01-16 2:05PM in room 325.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-26-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor