+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on TOU/AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU/AGR on Wednesday, 02-10-16 10:00AM in House conference room 312.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TOU/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor