+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 392-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor