+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:20PM in Conference Room 329.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 329.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 11:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Slom Member.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Nakashima, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Fale Member.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 661) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3404) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-14 10:05AM in conference room 211.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2970) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 377).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Ward.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:00AM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 11:00AM.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 412-14), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Takayama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-11-14 8:45AM in House conference room 309.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Say, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-03-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor