+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-10-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor