+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 025, 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1125).
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Act 025, on 4/17/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1125).
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495).
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-04-14.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3246) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-14 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 108).
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 559-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Kawakami.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-07-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 113-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Takayama, Ing, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Yamane.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-31-14 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor