+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:20PM in Conference Room 329.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 329.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 11:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Kidani Member.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Woodson Co-Chairs; Fale Member.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 658) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3271) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:35AM in conference room 211.
- The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-28-14 9:35AM in conference room 211.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2969) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 196).
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 737-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Ward.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 5:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 297-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Awana, Ichiyama, Say, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy, Hanohano; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-03-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor