+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
- The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/EGH deferred the measure until 03-20-14 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-14 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/EGH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 367).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Carroll, Evans, Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, Choy, Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ohno, Say, Takai, Takayama voting no (8) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Awana, Belatti, Fale, Hanohano, Kobayashi, McKelvey, Oshiro, Takayama voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Luke, Nakashima, Thielen, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 690-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Takayama; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-27-14 2:00PM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02/27/14 at 2:00 PM.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 22
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Saturday, 02-08-14 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
- Re-referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 14
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor