+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, D. Kobayashi, McDermott, Quinlan, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor