+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-06-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor