+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS/CPH, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 358).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
- Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1192) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 02-21-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor