+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 02-08-16 3:00PM in House conference room 329.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor