+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 190, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Act 190, on 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Ito excused (3).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 73-14) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 73-14).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:35PM in conference room 225.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 225.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 11:00AM in conference room 225.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-14 10:30AM in conference room 225.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Slom Member.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Rhoads, Thielen Members.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 654) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3384) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-14 9:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2856) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE, WAM.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 106).
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 223-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Say, Nishimoto, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-04-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor