+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-05-16 9:01AM in House conference room 312.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor