+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 243).
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 369-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-11-20 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor