+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 17 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, K.Kahele, Kim, Ruderman, Slom . 8 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Green, Harimoto, Ihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 669).
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say, Takumi, Thielen, Ward, Woodson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Jordan, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Pouha, Tupola voting no (10) and none excused (0).
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 05-03-16.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-28-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 7-16).
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-28-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 7-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-22-16 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 224.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-22-16 at 3:00PM in Conference Room 224.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 627).
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-22-16 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 224.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Rhoads, Luke, Cullen, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-22-16 2:00PM in conference room 224.
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s).
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 618).
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Slom.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656).
- House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Rhoads as Co-Chairs.
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-16 3:00PM in conference room 224.
- House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Pouha.
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 618) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 17; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Ruderman, Wakai . Noes, 6 (Senator(s) English, Green, Harimoto, Ihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
- Floor amendment failed as amended (SD 2) following Roll Call vote: Ayes, 8; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Green, Ihara, Kim. Noes, 15 (Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Inouye, K.Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi, Nishihara, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Tokuda, Wakai). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen).
- Floor Amendment No. 4 offered.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3598) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Wakai, Slom ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) English, Riviere; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3058) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 2:55PM in conference room 224.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 320).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Thielen, Ward, Woodson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Jordan, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Tupola voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1012-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Pouha, Ward; 3 Noes: Representative(s) DeCoite, Jordan, Lowen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:00AM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) DeCoite, McKelvey, Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 212-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Say.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-08-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.