+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 054, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Act 054, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 200).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 200) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Mizuno, Kitagawa, DeCoite, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:10PM in conference room 329.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 329.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 3:15PM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Mizuno, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Okimoto.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 709) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2046) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 357).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1219) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from LHE/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 731) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say.
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/HLT on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LHE/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor