+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 at 2:00 pm.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-08-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.