+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Evans, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Creagan.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-10-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 02-10-14.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor