+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 334).
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 967-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:15AM in House conference room 423.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor