+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-17 2:05PM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-17 at 2:05PM.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.