+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 449-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Tokioka, Tsuji; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-06-14 9:40AM in House conference room 312.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, HSG, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor