+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS/EET, WAM.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 92).
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 424-20), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
- Reported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 247-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Tuesday, 02-04-20 11:05AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor