+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
On July 8, 2020 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On July 6, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 601) in amended form (SD 2).
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20.
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3777) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 07-02-20 10:00AM in conference room Auditorium.
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from CPH/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3480) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Dela Cruz.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to CPH/EDU, JDC/WAM.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Gates, McKelvey, Okimoto, San Buenaventura, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, McDermott, Tokioka voting no (3) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 643-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
- Reported from HLT/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 255-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; 3 Noes: Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Tokioka; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Ohno.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/LHE on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:15PM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor