+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 40).
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Choy, Holt, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 795-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Keohokalole, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Holt; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from PBS/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 314-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS/VMI on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:05AM in House conference room 312.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to PBS/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.