+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 197).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 738) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Evans, Har, C. Lee.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 02-11-13 3:30PM in conference room 325.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-11-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor