+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3626) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-12-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 1:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, WAM.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 90).
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-20 10:20AM in conference room 423.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor