+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 353).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, McDermott, Ohno voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 888-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 541-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor