+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.