+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-18 9:35AM in conference room 229.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/TRE, WAM.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 104).
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 438-18), recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, McDermott.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-12-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 198-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 13
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor