+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332).
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 977-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nakamura, Nishimoto.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
- Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 433-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite, Morikawa.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor