+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 305).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Keohokalole, McKelvey, Morikawa, Pouha, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 970-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and none excused (0).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 377-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and Excused: none.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-12-16 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 54-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor