+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 335-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-10-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor