+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, McKelvey, Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Oshiro, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 494-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Woodson.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor