+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on OMH/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/EEP on Friday, 01-31-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to OMH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor