+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 11, 2018 in the House:
- Act 190, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
On July 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 190, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 696).
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tupola excused (3).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18.
- The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Nishimoto, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 11:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 832).
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; S. Chang.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Tupola.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 721) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-10-18.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3533) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3078) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 334).
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1124-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 412-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-09-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor